U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00428-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JACKSON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 22, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 11, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 11, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 11, 2021: [Exclude]
  • June 11, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
May, 2021
  • May 20, 2021: [.Order]
  • May 20, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 20, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • May 19, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • May 18, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 18, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.