U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00313-1
  • Case Name: USA v. RAHM III
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • September 14, 2021: [Notice of Substitution of Counsel]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • September 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • September 13, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2021
  • June 11, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 11, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 11, 2021: [Exclude]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [.Order]
  • May 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 19, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 19, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 19, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.