U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00434-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BREHENY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 04, 2023: [Continue ]
December, 2022
  • December 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
October, 2022
  • October 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2022: [Continue ]
August, 2022
  • August 08, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 08, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 05, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 30, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 30, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 27, 2022: [Continue ]
May, 2022
  • May 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Deadlines/Hearings]
  • May 02, 2022: [Continue ]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 09, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Pretrial Memorandum]
January, 2022
  • January 27, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 14, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
December, 2021
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 01, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 20, 2021: [Exclude]
  • October 20, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
August, 2021
  • August 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 20, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 20, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
May, 2021
  • May 21, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 20, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.