U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00371-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SUNSTRUM
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 01, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
October, 2021
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 07, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 20, 2021: [Exclude]
  • September 20, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 03, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • July 14, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2021: [Exclude]
  • July 12, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 07, 2021: [Protective Order]
May, 2021
  • May 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • May 28, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • May 28, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • May 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • May 27, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • May 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 27, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 27, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 27, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • May 21, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • May 20, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 20, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.