U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00439-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MARTINEZ
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 15, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Add and Terminate Attorneys]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 07, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 24, 2021: [.Order]
  • June 24, 2021: [Bond Hearing]
  • June 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 16, 2021: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • June 16, 2021: [Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision to District Court - Magistrate Judge Case]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • June 11, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • June 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 11, 2021: [Temporary Detention ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Exclude]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2021: [Continue ]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • May 25, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • May 21, 2021: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • May 21, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.