U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00397-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BOCHENE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 11, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 11, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 11, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 11, 2021: [~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys]
  • June 11, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 11, 2021: [Exclude]
  • June 11, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 02, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
May, 2021
  • May 24, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.