U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00390-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JURAN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
June, 2021
  • June 23, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 03, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • June 03, 2021: [.Order]
May, 2021
  • May 27, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • May 27, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 27, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 27, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • May 27, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • May 27, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • May 26, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • May 25, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 25, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.