U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00411-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SCOTT
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
August, 2021
  • August 01, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 23, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Bond ]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release with Global Positioning System Monitoring]
  • June 25, 2021: [Bond ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • June 02, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Disclosure ]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • May 28, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • May 28, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • May 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • May 28, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • May 28, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • May 28, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • May 26, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • May 26, 2021: [.Order]
  • May 26, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 25, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 25, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.