U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00438-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WEIBLING
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • October 20, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
September, 2021
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 24, 2021: [Exclude]
  • September 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • July 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 22, 2021: [Exclude]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Disclosure ]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • June 07, 2021: [Travel ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 03, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2021
  • May 26, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 25, 2021: [.Order]
  • May 25, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 25, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.