U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00442-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GRACE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 26, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 01, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 01, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 28, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.