U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00451-1
  • Case Name: USA v. LIPSCOMBE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • May 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Exclude]
April, 2022
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 12, 2022: [Exclude]
March, 2022
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • March 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 17, 2022: [Exclude]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • March 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 02, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Exclude]
February, 2022
  • February 08, 2022: [.Order]
January, 2022
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 27, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 27, 2022: [Exclude]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 03, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 03, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 18, 2021: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • October 17, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • August 23, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Exclude]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 26, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 10, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 10, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 10, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 02, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • June 02, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 02, 2021: [Temporary Detention ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 02, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • May 28, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 28, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • May 27, 2021: [Seal Case]
  • May 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • May 27, 2021: [Complaint (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.