U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00444-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BROCKHOFF
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • July 20, 2021: [Protective Order ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 24, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 24, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 23, 2021: [.Order]
  • June 14, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 09, 2021: [.Order]
  • June 01, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 28, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.