U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00448-1
  • Case Name: USA v. THOMAS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 02, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 02, 2021: [Exclude]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 30, 2021: [Exclude]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • July 13, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • July 13, 2021: [Protective Order ]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 04, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 03, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 03, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 03, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
May, 2021
  • May 28, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • May 28, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • May 28, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.