U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00429-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GRAY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 07, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
July, 2021
  • July 29, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 01, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 01, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 01, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 01, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.