U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00396-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CLARK
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2022
  • December 19, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • December 19, 2022: [Memorandum in Opposition]
  • December 19, 2022: [Response to motion]
  • December 12, 2022: [Dismiss Case]
  • December 06, 2022: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • December 06, 2022: [Change Venue]
  • December 06, 2022: [Discovery]
November, 2022
  • November 28, 2022: [Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 28, 2022: [Faretta Hearing]
  • November 20, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • November 20, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • November 20, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
  • November 20, 2022: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • November 10, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 03, 2022: [Continue ]
September, 2022
  • September 19, 2022: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • September 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Hearing ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 01, 2022: [Continue ]
June, 2022
  • June 15, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 15, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 29, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 29, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 27, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 23, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 23, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 04, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 04, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
December, 2021
  • December 29, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 08, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 05, 2021: [Status Report]
  • November 04, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Status Report]
  • October 28, 2021: [Disclosure ]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 03, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
July, 2021
  • July 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 10, 2021: [.Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 09, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 09, 2021: [Exclude]
  • June 09, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 03, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 03, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 03, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.