U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00064
  • Case Name: ADMINISTRATIVE SUBPOENA NO. 690538 TO GANNETT SATELLITE INFORMATION NETWORK, LLC et al v. FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 08, 2021: [.Order]
  • June 08, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 07, 2021: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • June 07, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 05, 2021: [Notice of Withdrawal of Motion]
  • June 04, 2021: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 03, 2021: [LCvR 26.1 Certificate of Disclosure - Corporate Affiliations/Financial Interests]
  • June 03, 2021: [Motion to Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.