U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00441-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WALDEN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
August, 2021
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 17, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 17, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 17, 2021: [Exclude]
  • August 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
July, 2021
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2021
  • June 07, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 04, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 04, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 04, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 04, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.