U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00445-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PARKS et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 22, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 10, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 10, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 10, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 10, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 09, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 04, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 04, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 04, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 04, 2021: [.Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.