U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00463-1
  • Case Name: USA v. FORREST
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • June 23, 2021: [Substitute]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 08, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 08, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 08, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 08, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 08, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 06, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.