U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00384-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PEART
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Waiver]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 20, 2021: [Exclude]
  • October 18, 2021: [Waiver]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 19, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 18, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 18, 2021: [Exclude]
July, 2021
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • July 27, 2021: [.Order]
  • July 26, 2021: [Travel ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 22, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Exclude]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 21, 2021: [Receipt ]
  • June 21, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 08, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 08, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.