U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00071
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA v. SANDWICH ISLES COMMUNICATIONS, INC. et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Quash]
August, 2021
  • August 18, 2021: [Report and Recommendation]
  • August 17, 2021: [Status Report]
  • August 09, 2021: [.Order]
  • August 04, 2021: [Response to Order to Show Cause]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Order to Show Cause]
  • July 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 13, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Case Referred to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 25, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 25, 2021: [Response to motion]
  • June 24, 2021: [Order Referring Case to Magistrate Judge]
  • June 24, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 24, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 17, 2021: [Reply to opposition to motion]
  • June 09, 2021: [Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [Quash]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.