U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00465-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HERRINGTON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
June, 2022
  • June 13, 2022: [Notice of Error]
  • June 10, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • April 22, 2022: [Continue ]
  • April 22, 2022: [Exclude]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • March 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 10, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Exclude]
  • March 10, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
January, 2022
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 25, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 25, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 24, 2022: [Continue ]
  • January 24, 2022: [Exclude]
December, 2021
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 21, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 21, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 17, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 24, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • November 24, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • November 24, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • October 21, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 19, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Exclude]
  • August 30, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • August 05, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 02, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 25, 2021: [Exclude]
  • June 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • June 24, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 17, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 09, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 09, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • June 09, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 09, 2021: [.Order]
  • June 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.