U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00070
  • Case Name: SHARKNINJA OPERATING LLC et al v. IROBOT CORPORATION
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Withdraw]
  • August 02, 2022: [Withdraw]
June, 2021
  • June 17, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 10, 2021: [Order on Motion for Issuance of Letters Rogatory]
  • June 09, 2021: [Letters Rogatory]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.