U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00464-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PRICE
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 16, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 11, 2022: [Notice (Other)]
January, 2022
  • January 18, 2022: [Response to (non-motion) Document]
  • January 18, 2022: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • January 18, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 14, 2022: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 02, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • December 02, 2021: [Exclude]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
October, 2021
  • October 26, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 10, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 31, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • August 26, 2021: [.Order]
  • August 17, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • August 16, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • August 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 13, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • August 13, 2021: [Disclosure ]
June, 2021
  • June 21, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 21, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 21, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • June 10, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 10, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.