U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00460-1
  • Case Name: USA v. CREEK
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • October 21, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 12, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • October 07, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 06, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
September, 2021
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 17, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 04, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 13, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 25, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • June 25, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 25, 2021: [Exclude]
  • June 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Hearing ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • June 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 21, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • June 21, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2021: [Response to motion]
  • June 17, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • June 17, 2021: [Revoke]
  • June 17, 2021: [Hearing ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 11, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • June 10, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 10, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.