U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00471-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HOWARD
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Dismiss Case]
  • October 21, 2021: [Dismiss Case]
September, 2021
  • September 10, 2021: [.Order]
June, 2021
  • June 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance - Rule 5]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 14, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Arrest - Rule 5]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.