U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00469-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MOCK
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 01, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [.Order]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • June 28, 2021: [Miscellaneous Relief]
  • June 24, 2021: [Supplement to any document]
  • June 22, 2021: [Supplement to any document]
  • June 22, 2021: [Motion Hearing]
  • June 22, 2021: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • June 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 18, 2021: [Reply in Support]
  • June 17, 2021: [Response to motion]
  • June 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Hearing]
  • June 17, 2021: [Proposed Briefing Schedule]
  • June 17, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Stay]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Review]
  • June 16, 2021: [Order]
  • June 16, 2021: [Stay]
  • June 16, 2021: [Review]
  • June 15, 2021: [.Order]
  • June 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 11, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 11, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.