U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00454-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WILLIAMS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2022
  • August 05, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
June, 2022
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • June 03, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • June 03, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 02, 2022: [Continue ]
April, 2022
  • April 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • April 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • April 05, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 28, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 28, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 24, 2022: [Status Report]
  • February 04, 2022: [Continue ]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • January 26, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 03, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 05, 2021: [Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • October 28, 2021: [Status Report]
  • October 28, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • October 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 05, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • August 25, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 09, 2021: [Exclude]
  • August 09, 2021: [Continue ]
June, 2021
  • June 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 14, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 14, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 14, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • June 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 11, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 11, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 11, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.