U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00074
  • Case Name: IN RE: APPLICATION FOR ACCESS TO CERTAIN SEALED VIDEO EXHIBITS
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 02, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • June 24, 2021: [Notice of Supplemental Authority]
  • June 24, 2021: [.Order]
  • June 17, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 16, 2021: [Reply to (non-motion) Document]
  • June 16, 2021: [Certificate of Service]
  • June 14, 2021: [Filing Fee Received]
  • June 14, 2021: [Motion For Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.