U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00462-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JOHNSON
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 22, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 22, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 22, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 22, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 17, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • June 17, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 14, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 14, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 14, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 14, 2021: [.Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.