U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00091
  • Case Name: IN RE APPLICATION OF THE NEW YORK TIMES COMPANY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 06, 2021: [Memorandum & Opinion]
  • December 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Order]
November, 2021
  • November 16, 2021: [Response to Order of the Court]
  • November 02, 2021: [Continue]
October, 2021
  • October 11, 2021: [Reply to opposition to motion]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 22, 2021: [Redacted Document]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Document]
  • September 20, 2021: [Order on Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 17, 2021: [Extension of Time to File Response/Reply]
  • September 17, 2021: [Response to motion]
  • September 10, 2021: [Unseal Document]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Continue]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 28, 2021: [.Order]
  • July 28, 2021: [Continue]
  • July 28, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 19, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 16, 2021: [Continue]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Continue]
  • June 30, 2021: [Notice of Appearance]
  • June 23, 2021: [Case Assigned/Reassigned]
  • June 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.