U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00496-1
  • Case Name: USA v. SPARKS et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 19, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order of Detention Pending Trial]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • July 07, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • July 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 07, 2021: [Exclude]
  • July 07, 2021: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • July 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 01, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Temporary Detention ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2021
  • June 24, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.