U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mc-00055
  • Case Name: UNITED STATES SECURITIES AND EXCHANGE COMMISSION v. IRIZARRY SANTIAGO
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 02, 2021: [.Order]
  • November 02, 2021: [Notice of Voluntary Dismissal]
September, 2021
  • September 17, 2021: [Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Status Report]
  • August 06, 2021: [Set/Reset Deadlines]
  • August 05, 2021: [.Order]
June, 2021
  • June 25, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 25, 2021: [.Order]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.