U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00483-1
  • Case Name: USA v. WEYER
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
February, 2022
  • February 03, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
November, 2021
  • November 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 23, 2021: [Continue ]
October, 2021
  • October 18, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • October 13, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • October 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 05, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
September, 2021
  • September 15, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • September 14, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 02, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 20, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 20, 2021: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • July 19, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 07, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • July 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 01, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 01, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • June 28, 2021: [.Order]
  • June 28, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 28, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 28, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.