U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00476-1
  • Case Name: USA v. VUKICH
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 13, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • July 13, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • July 12, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 01, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • June 29, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • June 29, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • June 29, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • June 29, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 28, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.