U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00491-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MCNICOLL
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
July, 2021
  • July 19, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 01, 2021: [.Order]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 01, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • June 29, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 28, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 28, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.