U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00488-1
  • Case Name: USA v. GARDNER, II
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 13, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
September, 2021
  • September 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 15, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 15, 2021: [Exclude]
  • September 15, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • September 08, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 09, 2021: [.Order]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 09, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • July 08, 2021: [.Order]
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 02, 2021: [Memorandum in Support of Pretrial Detention]
June, 2021
  • June 28, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • June 28, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 28, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.