U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00490-1
  • Case Name: USA v. PERRETTA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 01, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 09, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • July 08, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • July 07, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • July 07, 2021: [.Order]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 07, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 07, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2021
  • June 29, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.