U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00502-1
  • Case Name: USA v. JURLINA
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 05, 2023: [Continue ]
  • January 05, 2023: [Speedy Trial ]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
September, 2022
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 13, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 09, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
July, 2022
  • July 09, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 09, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 09, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
March, 2022
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • March 10, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 04, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 18, 2021: [Stipulation]
  • November 17, 2021: [Exclude]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 06, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 27, 2021: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 09, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 05, 2021: [Appear]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 30, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.