U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00503-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BROWN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
January, 2023
  • January 09, 2023: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
November, 2022
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Continue ]
  • November 04, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
September, 2022
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • September 12, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 07, 2022: [Continue ]
  • September 07, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
July, 2022
  • July 06, 2022: [Continue ]
  • July 06, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
May, 2022
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • May 06, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • May 05, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 05, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
March, 2022
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 07, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 02, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 02, 2022: [Speedy Trial ]
February, 2022
  • February 11, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
January, 2022
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • January 05, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 05, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 03, 2022: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 17, 2021: [Exclude]
  • November 16, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 16, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 04, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 07, 2021: [Continue ]
July, 2021
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 07, 2021: [.Order]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 30, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 30, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • June 29, 2021: [Seal Case]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.