U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00504-1
  • Case Name: USA v. O'MALLEY
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
December, 2021
  • December 02, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
September, 2021
  • September 08, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Protective Order ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 07, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 06, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • September 05, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 05, 2021: [Exclude]
  • September 05, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • September 05, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 07, 2021: [.Order]
  • July 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 07, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 30, 2021: [Search and Seizure Warrant Returned Executed]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.