U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00505-1
  • Case Name: USA v. TENNEY, III et al
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
October, 2021
  • October 25, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
September, 2021
  • September 27, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 22, 2021: [Order on Motion for Return of Passport]
  • September 20, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 17, 2021: [Status Report]
  • September 16, 2021: [Return of Passport ]
  • September 13, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • September 13, 2021: [Status Conference]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Status Report]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 13, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • July 12, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 07, 2021: [.Order]
  • July 07, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 07, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 07, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 07, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 07, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 07, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 07, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
June, 2021
  • June 30, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • June 30, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • June 30, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • June 29, 2021: [Order on Motion to Seal Case]
  • June 29, 2021: [Seal Case]
  • June 29, 2021: [Complaint (Sealed)]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.