U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00430-1
  • Case Name: USA v.BINGHAM
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
March, 2022
  • March 21, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
February, 2022
  • February 22, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 22, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 17, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 10, 2022: [Status Report]
December, 2021
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 17, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 17, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • December 16, 2021: [Continue ]
November, 2021
  • November 09, 2021: [Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Status Report]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 27, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • October 27, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 25, 2021: [Continue ]
  • October 07, 2021: [Status Report]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • August 23, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 23, 2021: [Exclude]
  • August 20, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 09, 2021: [Response to motion]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Modify]
  • August 09, 2021: [.Order]
  • August 06, 2021: [Modify]
  • August 06, 2021: [Modify Conditions of Release]
  • August 05, 2021: [Protective Order ]
July, 2021
  • July 09, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 07, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 02, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 01, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 01, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 01, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 01, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 01, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 01, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 01, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.