U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00512-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MOERSCHEL
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 10, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • August 02, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion for Leave to Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 21, 2021: [Supplement to any document]
  • July 14, 2021: [Appear Pro Hac Vice]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 12, 2021: [.Order]
  • July 12, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 12, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 12, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 12, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 12, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Corrected Docket Entry]
  • July 12, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 12, 2021: [Appear]
  • July 08, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 04, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 02, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • July 02, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 02, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.