U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00489-1
  • Case Name: USA v. HAYNES
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 23, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
August, 2021
  • August 13, 2021: [Revoke]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Revoke]
  • August 06, 2021: [Order on Sealed Motion for Leave to File Document Under Seal]
  • August 06, 2021: [Response to motion]
  • August 06, 2021: [Revoke]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 09, 2021: [.Order]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 09, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 09, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 09, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 09, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 09, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions for High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • July 02, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 02, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • July 02, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.