U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00511-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DUONG
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
August, 2021
  • August 27, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 14, 2021: [Transcript]
  • July 13, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • July 13, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 08, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions for High Intensity Supervision Program]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 06, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 06, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 06, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 06, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 06, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 06, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 06, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 06, 2021: [Arrest ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.