U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00519-1
  • Case Name: USA v. MINTZ
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 23, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
March, 2022
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 31, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 31, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • March 29, 2022: [Continue ]
  • March 29, 2022: [Exclude]
  • March 25, 2022: [Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance by Assistant U.S. Attorney]
February, 2022
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • February 24, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • February 24, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • February 23, 2022: [Continue ]
  • February 23, 2022: [Exclude]
December, 2021
  • December 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • December 10, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • December 09, 2021: [Continue ]
  • December 09, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
October, 2021
  • October 20, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • October 20, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • October 18, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • August 30, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • August 27, 2021: [Continue ]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release with Global Positioning System Monitoring]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • August 10, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • August 10, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • August 10, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • August 10, 2021: [Commit Defendant to Custody of Attorney General]
  • August 02, 2021: [Exclude]
  • August 02, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
July, 2021
  • July 30, 2021: [.Order]
  • July 28, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 28, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 28, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Status Conference]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 14, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 13, 2021: [Pretrial Memorandum]
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice (Other)]
  • July 13, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Temporary Detention]
  • July 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 13, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 13, 2021: [Temporary Detention ]
  • July 13, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
  • July 13, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 09, 2021: [Complaint]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.