U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00522-1
  • Case Name: USA v. IRAVANI
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
November, 2021
  • November 19, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 01, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
October, 2021
  • October 29, 2021: [Continue ]
September, 2021
  • September 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 24, 2021: [Continue ]
  • September 01, 2021: [Order on Motion to Amend/Correct ]
August, 2021
  • August 30, 2021: [Amend/Correct]
  • August 23, 2021: [Order on Motion to Travel ]
  • August 23, 2021: [Travel ]
July, 2021
  • July 26, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • July 26, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 21, 2021: [Exclude]
  • July 21, 2021: [Continue ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 14, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 13, 2021: [Order on Motion for Release from Custody ]
  • July 13, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 13, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 13, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 13, 2021: [Release from Custody ]
  • July 13, 2021: [Arrest ]
  • July 13, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 13, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.