U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00510-1
  • Case Name: USA v. DRESSEL
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
September, 2021
  • September 14, 2021: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
July, 2021
  • July 21, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • July 20, 2021: [Disclosure ]
  • July 19, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 19, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • July 16, 2021: [Protective Order ]
  • July 16, 2021: [.Order]
  • July 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 16, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 16, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 16, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 16, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 16, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - USA]
  • July 15, 2021: [Notice of Attorney Appearance - Defendant]
  • July 15, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 15, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Arrest Warrant Returned Executed ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.