U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia

district of columbia Public Records Search

Been Verified
Court Information:
  • Court Name: U.S. District Court for the District of Columbia
Case Information:
  • Case Number: 1:21-mj-00498-1
  • Case Name: USA v. BROWN
  • Filing Type: District
Filing History
May, 2022
  • May 19, 2022: [Terminate Merged Defendant]
  • May 19, 2022: [Terminate Deadlines and Hearings]
  • May 12, 2022: [Continue ]
  • May 12, 2022: [Exclude]
March, 2022
  • March 23, 2022: [Status Conference]
  • March 21, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • March 21, 2022: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • March 16, 2022: [Continue ]
February, 2022
  • February 10, 2022: [Status Report]
January, 2022
  • January 26, 2022: [Rule 5 (c)(3) Documents Received]
  • January 14, 2022: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • January 14, 2022: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • January 12, 2022: [Continue ]
December, 2021
  • December 16, 2021: [Order on Motion for Disclosure ]
  • December 16, 2021: [Disclosure ]
November, 2021
  • November 12, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • November 12, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • November 10, 2021: [Continue ]
  • November 09, 2021: [Status Report]
October, 2021
  • October 28, 2021: [Status Report]
  • October 07, 2021: [Status Report]
September, 2021
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Exclude]
  • September 09, 2021: [Order on Motion to Continue ]
  • September 09, 2021: [Set/Reset Hearings]
  • September 09, 2021: [Exclude]
  • September 09, 2021: [Continue ]
August, 2021
  • August 16, 2021: [Protective Order]
  • August 11, 2021: [Protective Order ]
July, 2021
  • July 15, 2021: [Case Unsealed]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order Setting Conditions of Release]
  • July 15, 2021: [.Order]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion for Speedy Trial ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Initial Appearance]
  • July 15, 2021: [Detention Hearing]
  • July 15, 2021: [Order on Motion to Unseal Case]
  • July 15, 2021: [~Util - Set/Reset Hearings]
  • July 15, 2021: [Speedy Trial - Excludable Start]
  • July 15, 2021: [Speedy Trial ]
  • July 15, 2021: [Appoint Counsel]
  • July 15, 2021: [Unseal Case]
  • July 15, 2021: [Arrest - Other District ]
Remove My Record
To request the removal of your records, please upload documentation that verifies your eligibility, such as expungement paperwork, court orders, or other relevant legal documents in compliance with federal, state, county, or city laws applicable to your jurisdiction. Ensure that the documents do not contain sensitive personal information unless absolutely necessary. You may also include any other supporting reasons for the request to delete your information.